FL S1624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish by rule specified initial license fees and annual license renewal fees for specified marijuana establishments; authorizing the department to charge an application fee, which may not exceed the cost of processing the application, etc.
Title
Fees/Marijuana Establishments
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1696 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1624 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1624/BillText/Filed/HTML |