FL S1642 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the affordable housing property exemption to exempt from ad valorem taxation, rather than provide a discount to, certain multifamily projects after a certain timeframe; providing a sales tax exemption for certain aircraft equipment used as part of certain governmental contracts; providing a credit against the corporate income tax, the sales and use tax, or a stated combination of the two taxes to a qualifying business that establishes a qualifying project for the creation of intellectual property which meets certain capital investment criteria, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-10SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2020-02-06SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1268 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1961978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback