FL S1656 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the offense of lewd or lascivious grooming; ranking the offense on the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code; revising the ranking of specified child exploitation offenses for purposes of the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, etc.
Title
Child Exploitation Offenses
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | Sen. Jonathan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1545 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1545 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1545 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-74
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
800 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |