FL S1662 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1351
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1351
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "certified homeless youth"; providing that a minor who is a certified homeless youth or who has had the disabilities on nonage removed under specified provisions may obtain a certified copy of his or her birth certificate; providing that unaccompanied youths who are certified homeless youths 16 years of age or older who apply to a court to have the disabilities of nonage removed shall have court costs waived; requiring a court to advance such cases on the calendar, etc.
Title
Homeless Youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1351 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 718 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -SJ 697 | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/12 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-13 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time -SJ 507 | |
2012-02-13 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/31/12, 15 minutes after recess of session, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 226 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 226 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
382 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
743 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |