FL S1826 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February 29, 2024, as "Israel Day at the Capitol", etc.
Title
Israel Day at the Capitol
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8045 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1826 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1826/BillText/Filed/HTML |