FL S1830 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring all prescriptions for medicinal drugs to be electronically generated and transmitted to the pharmacist filling the prescription; prohibiting electronic prescribing from interfering with a patient's freedom to choose a pharmacy; prohibiting the use of certain advertisements or functions in electronic prescribing software which may influence the prescribing decision of a prescribing practitioner or his or her agent at the point of care for a patient, etc.
Title
Electronic Prescribing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1830 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1830/BillText/Filed/HTML |