FL S1856 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring proof of a specified identification number for certain applicants for a driver license; deleting a provision authorizing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to require applicants to produce certain documents from the United States Department of Homeland Security for certain purposes; prohibiting a licensee from obtaining a duplicate or replacement instruction permit or driver license, renewing a driver license, or changing his or her name or address, respectively, except upon submission of specified identification documents under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Driver Licenses and Identification Cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1451 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1856 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1856/BillText/Filed/HTML |