FL S1868 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a county, municipality, or special district to identify and disclose the costs of a federally funded project which will not be funded by the federal grant; requiring the entity to disclose a plan for funding the project after the depletion of federal funds; authorizing a person to file a civil action to enforce the disclosure of unfunded, long-term costs of a county, municipality, or special district project funded by a federal grant; providing an exception for federal grants associated with natural disasters, grants involving the Federal Emergency Management Agency, grants received from the Department of Homeland Security, or Medicaid funds, etc.
Title
Federal Grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget | |
2012-02-23 | Now in Budget | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 556 | |
2012-02-15 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/20/12, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 308 | |
2012-01-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-30 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/30/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 243 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 243 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |