FL S1882 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to continually maintain an online application process for the issuance of licenses; prohibiting the department from arbitrarily or subjectively restricting access to the online application process, etc.
Title
Issuance of Licenses to Carry Concealed Weapons or Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1343 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee