FL S1884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a health care practitioner to notify a patient in writing upon referring the patient to certain providers and hospitals under certain circumstances; providing requirements for such notice, etc.
Title
Duty to Notify Patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H955 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1884 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1884/BillText/Filed/HTML |