FL S2000 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001 -SJ 571
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001 -SJ 571
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing moneys for the annual period beginning July 1, 2012, and ending June 30, 2013, to pay salaries, and other expenses, capital outlay - buildings, and other improvements, and for other specified purposes of the various agencies of state government, etc. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001 -SJ 571 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 557 | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced -SJ 532 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 532 | |
2012-02-16 | SPB 7050 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2000) by Budget |