FL S2068 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5701 -SJ 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5701 -SJ 586
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the collection of allowances of the amount of tax due by persons who file returns only by electronic means and pay the amount due on such returns only by electronic means; deleting provisions that provide for the collection of such allowances by persons who file paper returns; adopting the 2012 version of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of ch. 220, F.S.; requiring the Department of Revenue to provide adequate notice to affected taxpayers relating to earlier due dates for making an estimated payment, etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 5701 -SJ 586 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 585 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-15 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/15/12, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 340 | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Budget -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-01-27 | Introduced -SJ 281 | |
2012-01-27 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 303 | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Budget -SJ 281 | |
2012-01-25 | Filed | |
2012-01-25 | SPB 7182 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2068) by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |