FL S2504 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-125, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-125, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the resolution of certain collective bargaining issues at impasse between the State of Florida and certified bargaining units of state employees; providing for all other mandatory collective bargaining issues at impasse that are not addressed by the act or the General Appropriations Act to be resolved consistent with personnel rules and by otherwise maintaining the status quo, etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#473 (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#126 (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#126 (Y: 78 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Chapter No. 2017-125, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70) | |
2017-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 110 NAYS 2 |
2017-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted (959350) 1418 |
2017-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2017-05-08 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (959350) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Latvala (Chair), Flores (Vice Chair), Baxley (At Large), Benacquisto (At Large), Bradley (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Clemens (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Montford (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bean (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Clemens, Perry; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Grimsley (Chair), Bean, Broxson, Campbell, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodriguez, Rouson, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Flores (Chair), Baxley, Book, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Galvano (Chair), Bradley, Clemens, Farmer, Lee, Simmons; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre-K - 12 Education/Pre K - 12 Education: Simmons (Chair), Broxson, Farmer, Grimsley, Lee, Montford, Rouson, Young; Appropriations Conference Committee on the Environment and Natural Resources/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Bradley (Chair), Book, Braynon, Hutson, Latvala, Mayfield, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Brandes (Chair), Benacquisto, Gainer, Gibson, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Simpson, Thurston |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Representatives Trujillo (Chair), Moraitis (At Large), Berman (At Large), Bileca (At Large), Boyd (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Cummings (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), DuBose (At Large), McGhee (At Large), Metz (At Large), Moskowitz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), Sprowls (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Stark (At Large) |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | In returning messages |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by the House and we accede to conference |
2017-04-13 | House | Immediately certified |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 78 NAYS 37 |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (085369) |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Substituted for HB 5005 |
2017-04-12 | House | Received |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-12 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5005 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Line Item(s) Overridden 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
H5707 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
H5701 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Line Item(s) Overridden 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
H5707 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)
H5701 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125)