FL S7012 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2021-118)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2021-118)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions abrogating the scheduled repeals of public records exemptions relating to criminal history information of juveniles, etc.
Title
OGSR/Criminal History Information of Juveniles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2021-118) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Substituted HB 7009 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/03/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |
Same As/Similar To
H7009 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Chapter No. 2021-118
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |