GA HB1026 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-16-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to authorization of law enforcement contracts with municipalities, reimbursement, employment and expenditures, and exception, so as to change the provisions relative to population brackets and the census regarding the exception to such Code section; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Municipalities; law enforcement contracts; population brackets and census; change provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #787 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #583 - Passage (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #583 - Passage (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 694 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |