GA HB1061 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-6-47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from the certificate of need program, so as to enact the "Trauma Care Expansion Act of 2010"; to exempt hospitals which have been designated as a Level I or II trauma center by the Department of Community Health from certificate of need requirements under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trauma Care Expansion Act of 2010; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Butler [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
Rep. Len Walker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | House Postponed | |
2010-03-22 | House Postponed | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-04 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-03 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/29484 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hb1061_LC_33_3441_a_2.htm |