GA HB127 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prestige license plates and special plates for certain persons and vehicles, so as to provide for special license plates for amateur radio operators; to provide for conditions; to provide for a design; to provide for a list of eligible names; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates; amateur radio operators; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-14 House Withdrawn, Recommitted
2011-03-10 House Withdrawn, Recommitted
2011-03-01 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-02-22 House Withdrawn, Recommitted
2011-02-10 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-02-03 House Second Readers
2011-02-02 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback