GA HB158 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding superior courts, so as to change the name of the Stone Mountain Judicial Circuit to the DeKalb Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; change name of Stone Mountain Judicial Circuit to DeKalb Judicial Circuit
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Shea Roberts [D] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Omari Crawford [D] |
Rep. Saira Draper [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #800 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #436 (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #436 (Y: 156 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hopper |