GA HB26 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-64 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance of limited driving permits for certain offenders, so as to allow for issuance of a limited driving permit to a driver who has had his or her license suspended for driving on a suspended license; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Limited driving permits; certain offenders; allow issuance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers | |
2010-11-30 | House Prefiled |