GA HB26 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding parks, historic areas, memorials, and recreation; to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to transportation passenger safety; to amend Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to game and fish; to amend Part 2 of Article 10 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to parking for persons with disabilities, so as to revise certain laws regarding the carrying of firearms; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Constitutional Carry Act of 2013; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Gregory [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] |
Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-31 | House | House Hopper |
2012-12-19 | House | House Prefiled |