GA HB26 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to change the qualifications of an investor relative to an income tax credit for certain investments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; investor relative to an income tax credit for certain investments; change qualifications
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-18 | House | House Prefiled |