GA HB272 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from City of Chamblee ad valorem taxes for city purposes in the amount of $30,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of that city who are under 65 years of age, approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3591), so as to increase the exemption amount to $50,000.00; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, applicability, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chamblee, City of; ad valorem tax; certain residents under 65 years of age; increase homestead exemption amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 104 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |