GA HB319 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to extend an exemption from state sales and use tax only for a limited period of time regarding the sale or use of tangible personal property to certain nonprofit health centers; to extend an exemption for a limited period of time regarding sales to certain nonprofit volunteer health clinics; to extend for a limited period of time an exemption with respect to certain sales of eligible food and beverages to a qualified food bank; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax exemptions; nonprofit health centers, clinics, and food banks; extend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House Vote #40 - Passage (Y: 156 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-23 | House First Readers |