GA HB396 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend provisions of the O.C.G.A. relating to drivers and drivers' licenses; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to drivers' licenses, so as to allow the commissioner of driver services to promulgate regulations limiting the retention of conviction and withdrawal information on a driving record; to amend Chapter 13 of Title 40 of O.C.G.A., relating to prosecution of traffic offenses, so as to provide for electronic signatures on uniform traffic citations; to amend Chapter 16 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Driver Services, so as to provide the department with the power to contract for services; to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses, so as to provide for fingerprinting of certain licensees; to amend Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to public utilities and transportation, so as to provide for fingerprinting of chauffeurs; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' licenses; driving record; uniform traffic citations; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Graves [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #950 - Adopt Conference Committee Report #2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #439 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #323 - Motion To Table (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #99 - Pass (Y: 139 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #439 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #323 - Motion To Table (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #99 - Pass (Y: 139 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 633 | |
2010-06-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-21 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-21 | House Insists | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Insists | |
2010-04-14 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Tabled | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read Tabled | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-03 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-12 | House First Readers |