GA HR689 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging local boards of education and schools in Georgia to implement renewable energy systems to provide educational and cost-saving opportunities; and for other purposes.
Title
Local boards of education; implement renewable energy systems to provide educational and cost-saving opportunities; urge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39673 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/133757 |