GA SB273 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-22-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to clinical laboratories, so as to provide that certain nondiagnostic laboratories are not subject to state licensure as a clinical laboratory; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clinical Laboratories; provide certain nondiagnostic laboratories not subject to state licensure as clinical laboratory
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. JaNice VanNess [R] |
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #434 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #434 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 406 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |