GA SR693 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the City of Fort Oglethorpe Charter Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Fort Oglethorpe Charter Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |