HI HB1231 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TIA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TIA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to fund one or more programs sponsored or organized by a University of Hawaii community college or a four-year campus to expand opportunities for international college experiences for University of Hawaii students. Requires the University of Hawaii to work in collaboration with the department of business, economic development, and tourism and requires a report to be submitted to the legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To International Education Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TIA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TIA. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB200 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1231 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1231 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6