HI HB1256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the requirement that a driver of a motor vehicle yield to or stop for a pedestrian by specifying when a pedestrian is considered to be within an intersection or adjacent crosswalk or crossing the roadway within a crosswalk.
Title
Relating To Crosswalk Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1256 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB98 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 132, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
SB98 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 132, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1256&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1256_.HTM |