HI HB1296 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 098, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 098, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the State Hydrogen Implementation Coordinator. Establishes a Hydrogen Implementation Working Group. (HB1296 CD1)
Title
State Hydrogen Implementation Coordinator; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 098, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 098, on 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard, English, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Keohokalole, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ward. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Gabbard, English Co-Chairs; Green, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ing, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 614) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDT/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Harimoto. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT/ENE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EDT/ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-05-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |