HI HB139 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, sale or distribution of reusable drink and food containers intended for use by children under three and containing bisphenol A. (HB139 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-30 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-04 | House | Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused. |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-19 11:25AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB139 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19