HI HB142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 102, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 102, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that twenty-five per cent of proceeds from the transfer of credits be used by DHHL to develop rentals. Requires Kauai County and City & County of Honolulu to enter into MOA with DHHL to issue credits. Extends the sunset date for affordable housing credits for affordable housing developed on Hawaiian home lands by 4 years. (HB142 CD1)
Title
Hawaiian Home Lands; Affordable Housing Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 102, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 102, on 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 72). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 72) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Espero, Chun Oakland, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Ing, Luke, Keohokalole; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Espero, Chun Oakland, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Ing, Luke Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Pouha. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-15 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HWN/PSM/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/PSM/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN/PSM/HSH, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 30). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kawakami, Morikawa, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on OMH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to OMH. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-02-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |