HI HB1722 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for two advanced life support ambulances to be based in Puna and Makalei on the island of Hawaii and to be used during daily peak hours from 8:00 a.m. to 10:00 p.m., and to include vehicles, equipment, and personnel costs. Effective January 1, 2015. (HB1722 HD1)
Title
Emergency Medical Services; Advanced Life Support Ambulances; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14 at 11:00am. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-24 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-29-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-24-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |