HI HB1805 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 418).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 418).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prescription drug manufacturers to notify prescription drug benefit plans and pharmacy benefit managers if a proposed increase in the wholesale acquisition cost of certain drugs would result in a percentage increase of ten per cent or more than the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index over a twoyear period. Requires prescription drug manufacturers to notify prescription drug benefit plans and pharmacy benefit managers if a proposed reduction in rebates will result in a percentage increase of the net cost of the prescription drug of ten per cent or more, even if there is no change to the wholesale acquisition cost. Requires the drug manufacturer to identify and report to the insurance commissioner information on certain drugs whose wholesale acquisition cost increases by a certain amount during a specified time frame. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 418). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 614) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-08-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 11 offered. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3740) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-10 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 23 |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drug Manufacturers
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Rebates
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drug Manufacturers
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Rebates