HI HB1874 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 064, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 064, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands membership on the Task Force on Vog to include any representative or senator representing a district on the Island of Hawaii that is impacted by vog.
Title
Vog; Task Force on Vog; Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (S) Act 064, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Act 064, on 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165). | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 490). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3335) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from PGM/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2961) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM/HTH, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to PGM/HTH. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Takai, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Takumi. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-16-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |