HI HB2048 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes individual Department of Education schools and career pathways, academies, or programs operated within a school to engage in commercial enterprises related to the primary educational purposes of the school, career pathway, academy, or program. (HB2048 HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, McKelvey, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-12-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2051 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 169, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).