HI HB2178 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Livestock Revitalization Program of the Department of Agriculture a program to provide grants to qualified feed developers. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Agriculture; Livestock Revitalization Program; Qualified Feed Developer Grants; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-24-14 at 2:30PM in Conference Room 224. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 9:30AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:35AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 04-24-14 9:35AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 9:35AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 12:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-15-14 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Matsumoto Member. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3399) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2879) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 308). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-03-14 9:40AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |