HI HB2432 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes income received from deferred compensation retirement plans from the state income tax for taxpayers who meet certain income requirements. Effective 07/01/2030. (HD1)
Title
Deferred Compensation Retirement Plans; Income Tax Exclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 350). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Luke, Nakashima, Thielen, Woodson excused (5). |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 687-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |