HI HB2541 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes the state earned income tax credit refundable and permanent. Increases and amends the refundable food/excise tax credit by basing the amount of the credit on a taxpayer's Hawaii earned income and federal adjusted gross income. Increases minimum wage rate to $11.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2021, $12.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2022, $12.50 per hour beginning on 1/1/2023, and $13.00 per hour beginning on 1/1/2024. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Helping Working Families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 3:15PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 338).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, Matsumoto, Perruso, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-03-03HouseFloor amendment failed with Noes, 5 (Representative(s) Johanson, Luke, McKelvey, Perruso, Todd). Excused, 1 (Representative(s) Creagan).
2020-03-03HouseFloor Amendment No. 3 offered by Rep. Okimoto.
2020-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4).
2020-02-28HouseReported from LAB/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2020-02-21HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Quinlan.
2020-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-21-20 10:30AM in conference room 309.
2020-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on LAB/FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB/FIN on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LAB/FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3102 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to LCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback