HI HB2547 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 040, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 040, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation from the general revenues of the State of Hawaii for fiscal year 2011-2012 to address the budget shortfall in the general assistance program (HMS 204) in the Department of Human Services. (HB2547 HD1)
Title
General Assistance (HMS 204); Emergency Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | (S) Act 040, 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Act 040, on 4/20/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). | |
2012-04-11 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 502). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3326) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga. | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-02-12 10:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2839) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Ward. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-12 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-13-12 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation, proposed HD1 (Gov. Msg. No. 211). | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 193). | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2809 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.