HI HB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 128, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 128, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of private lands for the Ohana Zones Pilot Program. Provides additional time for the implementation of the Ohana Zones Pilot Program to June 30, 2023. Extends the Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program and the Medical Respite Pilot Program to June 30, 2020. Appropriates funds. (HB257 CD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act 128, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230). |
2019-06-28 | House | Act 128, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1230). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 39). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 39) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Brower, Nakamura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott. |
2019-04-22 | House | Re-referred to HSH, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 56 |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; S. Chang, Riviere Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 710) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1968) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-19 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1466) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-21-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HOU, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 359). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-19 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2019-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HSH/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HSG on Thursday, 02-14-19 11:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HSH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommitted to HSH as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Nakamura excused. |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HSH for further consideration. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:45AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:45PM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |