HI HB465 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1281).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the representative of labor on the Hawaii labor relations board to be a person whose name has been chosen by the exclusive representatives of the collective bargaining units through a process determined by a simple majority of exclusive representatives and submitted to the Governor for appointment with the advise and consent of the Senate. Allows a simple majority of the exclusive representatives who recommended the nominee to transmit the nominee's name directly to the Senate for confirmation if the governor fails to do so within twenty days after the exclusive representatives' submission of the nominee's name to the governor. Allows a simple majority of the exclusive representatives of the collective bargaining units to remove, via a written request to the governor, the representative of labor from the Hawaii labor relations board during the member's term. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1281). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1281). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Nakashima, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 677) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:30PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1). |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Sayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB678 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).