HI HB623 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 097, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 097, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases renewable portfolio standards to 30 percent by December 31, 2020, 70 percent by December 31, 2040, and 100 percent by December 31, 2045. Requires the Public Utilities Commission to include the impact of renewable portfolio standards, if any, on the energy prices offered by renewable energy developers and the cost of fossil fuel volatility in its renewable portfolio standards study and report to the Legislature. (HB623 CD1)
Title
Renewable Portfolio Standards; Clean Energy Initiative; Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 097, 06/08/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 097, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Nishimoto, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 625). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Galuteria, Ihara, Tokuda. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 436). |
2015-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1340) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McDermott, Tupola voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 862) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-02-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |