HI HB703 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money to match federal funds for medicaid. (HB703 HD1)
Title
Medicaid; Federal Funds; Disproportionate Share Hospital Allowance Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Joseph Bertram [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Lynn Finnegan [R] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 147). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-09 4:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Pine, Takai excused (2). | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Finnegan. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS-HLT on Thursday, 02-05-09 10:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |