HI HB724 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB724
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the application of travel restrictions implemented during a state of emergency or local state of emergency to essential workers unless the application of those travel restrictions to essential workers has first been approved by the governor. Defines essential workers for this purpose. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from PDP/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by PDP/ECD on Thursday, 02-04-21 11:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/ECD on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP/ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).