HI HB764 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 019, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the requirement for a motor vehicle insurer to maintain a complete sales and claims service office does not apply to the county of Kalawao.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAct 019, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
2019-04-24HouseAct 019, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650).
2019-04-04SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1768) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 77).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Onishi.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB543 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback