HI HB766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB766
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to inventory historic properties and burial sites in the State, collect data on burial site locations, and conduct an archaeological surface survey.
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB75 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
HB766 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB766 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Burial Sites
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division
Burial Sites
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Historic Properties
Inventory
State Historic Preservation Division
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=766&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB766_.HTM |