HI HB827 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB827
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture and Agribusiness Development Corporation to annually lease at least fifty per cent of land leased or up for lease renewal to operations whose primary business is local food production beginning 1/1/2022. Requires the Department of Agriculture and Agribusiness Development Corporation to submit reports to the legislature on leasing activities.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB335 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB827 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB827 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Department of Agriculture
Diversified Agriculture
Enterprise
Leased Lands
Local Food Production
Reporting Requirements
Department of Agriculture
Diversified Agriculture
Enterprise
Leased Lands
Local Food Production
Reporting Requirements
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=827&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB827_.HTM |