HI HB832 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 111, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 111, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the university laboratory school to conform its student enrollment profile to the standard prescribed by the University of Hawaii college of education in order to meet the University of Hawaii college of education's research requirements. (HB832 CD1)
Title
Public Charter Schools; Public School Service Area
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 111, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 111, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1211). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) LoPresti, Pouha, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 120). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 120) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Choy, Nishimoto, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630). |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Ichiyama added as Conferee. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Kong added as Conferee. Representative Say discharged as Conferee. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-22-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Choy, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Say, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to EDN, HED, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 18). |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ito, Matsumoto. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB832 (Same As) 2015-03-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.