HI HB889 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it clear that the police may grant applications to acquire firearms to lawful permanent resident aliens and United States Nationals.
Title
Relating To The Acquisition Of Firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1043 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB889 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
HB889 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=889&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB889_.HTM |